Alankrita Chopra

**VEDIC MATHEMATICS**

William Paul Thurston said that mathematics is not about equations, numbers, and algorithms it’s about understanding. It was rightly said because mathematics is a subject that requires constant practice and focuses to master our skills. It is something that most students are afraid of because of tough calculations and their applications yet we can overcome our fear of the subject by making an effort, Vedic mathematics is one of them.

**WHAT IS VEDIC MATHEMATICS?**

Vedic mathematics comes from the Sanskrit word ‘Veda’ which means knowledge. It is a collection of techniques and arithmetic that helps us to solve problems in a faster and simpler way. The most striking feature of Vedic mathematics is its simplicity and clarity. The sums that are considered to be difficult and lengthy can be solved mentally within minutes. It not only gives you clarity of thoughts but also improves your solving ability and promotes creativity.

**VEDIC MATHEMATICS AND ITS ADVANTAGES IN COMPETITIVE EXAMS**

Competitive exams can be quite difficult and pressurizing, with constant pressure on your head to do well, one might feel afraid and anxious. The students are expected to do fast calculations and have logical efficiency to do numerical-related questions. In such situations rather than sticking to the conventional methods, one should opt for Vedic mathematics.

**IMPROVES CONCENTRATION AND DETERMINATION OF LEARNING NEW THINGS**

Your mind acts as a calculator as you tend to do calculations mentally thus improving your memory and putting less burden on your brain for memorizing difficult concepts.

**IT IMPROVES YOUR QUESTION-SOLVING SPEED**

Every entrance exam has a certain number of questions that need to be completed in a limited amount of time. When we are running out of time knowing the tricks of some questions can be quite handy. Vedic mathematics helps us to solve questions 10 times faster than the original method, which means that we will not only save time but we can also get quick results.

**ACCURATE ANSWERS**

Most of us are afraid of mathematics because of our inability to solve questions and not getting the marks that we desire, but most of our marks are deducted because of our silly mistakes. Even though our approach to solving the question is correct, we make some mistakes that lead to incorrect answers. Therefore it becomes a concern to solve these mistakes, that’s when Vedic maths comes into play it allows you to use multiple methods to solve questions and there are fewer chances of failure or incorrect answers.

**IMPROVES YOUR MATHEMATICAL TRICKS**

We can find the square root of numbers; do subtraction, addition, and faster multiplication of numbers by using tricks of Vedic mathematics, which will help us more than conventional teaching methods.

Competitive exams like JEE, SATs, BITSAT, and all other examinations involving maths can be simply solved with tricks of Vedic maths.

For example:

**1)** **We have to subtract a number from 1000,10000 and 100000**

What we can do is we can subtract each figure from 9 and then subtract the last figure from 10

LIKE: 1000-624

Step 1: 9-6=3

Step 2: 9-2=7

Step 3: 10-4=6

**SO THE ANSWER IS**: 1000-624=376

**2)** **Multiplication of 2 digit numbers**

Step 1: Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number

Step 2: Multiply the result by 10

Step 3: Multiply the unit digits of both the two-digit numbers

Step 4: Now, add both the numbers

LIKE: MULTIPLY 12 AND 15 (12*15)

Step 1: 15+2= 17

Step 2: 17*10= 170

Step 3: 5*2=10

Step 4: 170 +10= 180

**SO THE ANSWER IS**: 15*12= 180

**3)** **For faster subtraction of numbers**

**4)** **Multiplication of numbers near or less than multiple of 10**

Step 1: subtract the numbers with their closest multiple of 10(like 99 from 100 and 998 from 1000)

Step 2: Multiply the results obtained.

Step 3: subtract the result with the opposite number

Step 4: Now, write the result of step 3 first followed by the result of step 2.

LIKE: MULTIPLY 99 AND 94(99*94)

Step 1: 100-99= 1 and 100-94 =6

Step 2: 1*6 = 6

Step 3: 99-6= 4 and 94-1 =93

Step 4: on combining 9306

**SO THE ANSWER IS**: 99*94 =9306

**5)** **If we get an equation and it is in the format (AC + D)/(BC + E) = A/B, then the result is A/B=D/E**

**6)** **Multiplication of a number with 5**

Step 1: Divide the number by 2

Step 2: If it is a whole number add 0 in the end else if it is fractional add 5 in the end

LIKE: 8256*5

STEP 1: 8256/2= 4128

STEP 2: 4128+0(in the end) = 41280

One more example, 7339*5

STEP 1: 7339/2=3669.5

STEP 2: since it is a fractional remainder we ignore the remainder and add 5 in the end.

3669+5(in the end) =36695

**7)** **Square of numbers between 30 to 50**

STEP 1: Subtract the given number from 50

STEP 2: square the number obtained

STEP 3: The subtracted number obtained in step 1, subtract it from 25

STEP 4: Now, First write the number obtained in step 3 followed by the last two digits of the number obtained in step 2.

LIKE: FIND THE SQUARE OF 42

STEP 1: 50-42=8

STEP 2: 8*8=64

STEP 3: 25-8=17

STEP 4: 1764

**SO THE ANSWER**: 1764

**8)** **Division of a large number by 5**

STEP 1: Multiply the number by 2

STEP 2: Move the decimal point

LIKE: 238/5

STEP 1: 238*2=476

STEP 2: 238/5 = 47.6 (after moving the decimal one place)

**SO THE ANSWER:** 47.6

Undoubtedly, there are various advantages of Vedic maths, it not only reduces your time but makes your brain more creative allowing you to develop a sense of confidence within yourself. Learning via Vedic mathematics can make you quicker and less stressed about difficult problems. It becomes easier for you to understand the concept and reduce your mistakes, but these tricks will only work when practiced and used with experience.

Hence it is advisable for all of us to learn Vedic maths because it’s not only simple but will help us achieve heights in the future.